THE FRIENDS OF WIX AND WRABNESS PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1009828
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds for the benefit of the children of Wix and Wrabness Primary School by means of Covenants and general fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2014
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 March 1992: Standard registration
- 10 November 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- FRIENDS OF WIX COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2010 | 06/04/2011 | 06/04/2012 | 06/04/2013 | 06/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.61k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2014 | 16 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2013 | 24 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2012 | 18 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH EAST ESSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window