ROTARY YOUTH LEADERSHIP AWARDS DISTRICT 1030
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Durham
- Northumberland
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 March 1992: Standard registration
- 11 August 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 August 2005: Funds transferred to 1064901 ROTARY INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 1030 CHARITABLE TRUS...
- R Y L A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 05 August 2005 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14-22 YEARS OF AGE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE-NORTH EAST ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window