SHIPLAKE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1009978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

P.T.F.A - to raise funds for Shiplake C of E Primary School, Shiplake Cross Oxfordshire. To enhance the educational and social well being of all pupils at the school. Various fund raising events are held and all the funds are returned to the school to enable them to provide enhanced activities for example, Christmas pantomime, books, cookery equipment etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £23,132
Total expenditure: £27,273

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHIPLAKE C E SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
  • THE SHIPLAKE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nicola McCartney Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Graham Gold Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Nicola Alice Dyer Trustee 04 September 2022
None on record
Sally M Howland Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/07/2019 10/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.00k £7.16k £3.05k £33.28k £23.13k
Total expenditure £20.00k £1.52k £7.43k £21.45k £27.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2019 14 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shiplake C of E Primary School
Memorial Avenue
Shiplake Cross
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 4DN
Phone:
01189402024