THE FRIENDS OF FOREST NEIGHBOURHOOD HOMES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improve the quality of life of the mentally handicapped, concentrating on the Neighbourhood Homes at Horsham, Haywards Heath and Bewbush (Crawley).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 March 1992: Standard registration
- 24 April 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.65k | £8.13k | £1.36k | £959 | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331 | £0 | £1.02k | £0 | £832 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH. FEBRUARY 1992 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED ON 26TH NOVEMBER 1997 UNDER SECTION 74(2)(C) OR (D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE RESIDENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE FOREST HOSPITAL, CRAWLEY ROAD, HORSHAM, WEST SUSSEX AND OTHER MENTALLY HANDICAPPED IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOMES.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window