Accounts and annual returns MERRY-GO-ROUND UNDER 5'S

Charity number: 1010031
Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 July 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 October 2023 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 July 2023 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 October 2023 459 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 October 2023 824 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 February 2021 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late Download Open in new window