Financial history MERRY-GO-ROUND UNDER 5'S

Charity number: 1010031
Charity reporting is up to date (326 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £125.56k £128.14k £114.19k £86.99k £97.83k
Total expenditure £111.49k £102.28k £95.31k £84.91k £138.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £110.43k £92.62k £73.00k N/A
Income from government grants £103.41k N/A N/A N/A £80.06k