GLOUCESTER COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Further the Christian faith by running a local church and related activities in and around Gloucester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 March 1992: Standard registration
- GLOUCESTER CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY CHURCHES (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Wisbey | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Philip Smith | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Shaw | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Leslie Wood | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Peter Shaw | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Bennett | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.25k | £93.57k | £84.38k | £92.42k | £110.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.89k | £153.89k | £103.83k | £101.76k | £121.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (2)THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. (3)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES
STROUD ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 5JR
- Phone:
- 01452565909
- Email:
- office@gcchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window