Financial history MILTON GREEN W I

Charity Number: 1010036
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £1.60k £1.77k £1.78k £1.85k £1.46k
Total expenditure £1.72k £1.58k £1.65k £1.52k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A