WADEBRIDGE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The W.S.A. organises social events that stregthen links between the school and the families of our pupils. Activities include Quiz Evenings, wine-tasting evenings, an annual Bingo evening and raffles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 March 1992: Standard registration
- 17 July 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WADEBRIDGE SCHOOL PARENTS STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 29/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £850 | £300 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £215 | £305 | £1.81k | £183 | £83 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 18 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 29 January 2014 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2012 | 13 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH. MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window