ST JOSEPH'S SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1010058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of Poverty Accomodation/Housing Elderly/Old People Provides Buildings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £274,806
Total expenditure: £168,071

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1992: Standard registration
  • 03 February 2016: Funds received from 224778-1 PILKINGTON ANNUITIES
  • 03 February 2016: Funds received from 224778-2 R A KNOX ANNUITIES
  • 03 February 2016: Funds received from 224778 MARIA YOUNG'S SPINSTERS' FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST JOSEPH'S SOCIETY (Working name)
  • ST JOSEPH'S SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Morley Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Christopher Ross Maguire Kemball Trustee 14 September 2021
ST ELIZABETH'S CENTRE
Received: On time
Alison Dykes Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Christine Ann Charles Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record
ALEXANDER ACLOQUE Trustee 22 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £191.91k £200.09k £280.82k £249.29k £274.81k
Total expenditure £219.76k £280.95k £172.24k £177.65k £168.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 18 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Joseph's House
42 Brook Green
W6 7BW
Phone:
02076039817
Website:

No information available