THE BRAIN AND SPINE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 1992: Standard registration
- 03 November 2005: Removed
- 03 November 2005: Funds transferred to 1098528 THE BRAIN AND SPINE FOUNDATION
- BSF (Working name)
- THE BRITISH BRAIN AND SPINE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE NEUROSURGICAL RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £645.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 25 July 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 25 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 25 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 7 FEBRUARY 1992 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 AUGUST 1992 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND TO MAKE GRANTS DONATIONS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR THAT PURPOSE, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH INTO NEUROLOGICAL DISEASE AND DISORDER AND RELATED FIELDS OF ENQUIRY AND INTO THE METHODS TECHNIQUES AND PRACTICE OF NEUROSURGERY AND SURGICAL INTERVENTION IN NEUROLOGICAL AND RELATED CASES AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND STUDY IN THESE FIELDS PROVIDED THAT ALL USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window