LOSANG DRAGPA BUDDHIST CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities include teaching meditation to Buddhists and Non-Buddhists and providing a spiritual education program and peaceful environmnet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 March 1992: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LOSANG DRAGPA CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.08k | £315.21k | £182.74k | £120.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.59k | £266.44k | £139.50k | £133.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 30 June 2009 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 17 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 24 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 December 2005 | 16 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2005 | 16 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 29 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | 12 May 2005 | 12 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 14 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED 28 APRIL 1993, 11 JUNE 1994, 1 APRIL 1995 AND 6 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION, THROUGH THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES: THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME, AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window