FRIENDS OF ECCLESTON COUNTY PRIMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity raises money through various events in order to provide our school with financial support by providing equipment beyond the school budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 March 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debra Reeves | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ross | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eccleston Primary School | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lylyk | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GINA QUAYLE | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.82k | £4.43k | £12.22k | £9.04k | £8.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.14k | £10.29k | £13.76k | £9.41k | £8.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 11 MARCH 1992, 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eccleston Primary School
Doctors Lane
Eccleston
CHORLEY
PR7 5RA
- Phone:
- 01257451114
- Email:
- head@eccleston.lancs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window