LAVENDER LINE PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE THE LAVENDER LINE RAILWAY STATION AND ITS ASSETS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- East Sussex
Governance
- 07 April 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Duncan Brown | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Brian George Humber MSc C Eng | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Colin Matthews | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Trula Matthews | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Healey | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Chamberlain | Trustee | 18 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.40k | £15.69k | £6.78k | £8.01k | £11.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £870 | £1.59k | £3.34k | £1.40k | £821 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED ON 16TH SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(I) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE, PRACTICE AND HISTORY OF RAILWAY ENGINEERING , LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK AND TRANSPORT AND OTHER FORMS OF TRANSPORT INCLUDING (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE ABOVE) THE PROVISION AND PRESERVATION OF A COLLECTION OF LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK AND OTHER APPROPRIATE OBJECTS FOR EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC (II) THE SUPPORT BY WAY OF DONATION OR OTHERWISE OF OTHER CHARITIES HAVING OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lavender Line Preservation Society
Isfield Station
Station Road
Isfield
UCKFIELD
TN22 5XB
- Phone:
- 01825 750515
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window