THE HERTFORDSHIRE GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Researching into the county's historic gardens and parks. Providing information and advice to local planning authorities and other parties. Working with schools to develop and sustain their grounds. Publishing newsletters and reports. Enhancing local and national archives. Assisting the Garden History Society with garden heritage. Providing an annual programme of events, outings and lectures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 March 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Flood | Chair | 03 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Leiper | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY MAUD POOL | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATE HARWOOD | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.58k | £6.09k | £7.05k | £6.78k | £17.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.70k | £4.42k | £4.31k | £4.56k | £4.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITIUTION ADOPTED 19TH. MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 17TH JULY 1995. as amended on 23 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF GARDEN LAND. (2)TO PRESERVE ENHANCE AND RECREATE FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC WHATEVER GARDEN LAND MAT EXIST OR HAVE EXISTED IN AND AROUND HERTFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ridgeways
Holly Grove Road
Bramfield
HERTFORD
Hertfordshire
SG14 2QH
- Phone:
- 07538971610
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window