Accounts and annual returns COOMBE HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1010155
Charity reporting is up to date (163 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 November 2024 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 10 November 2024 163 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 June 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 July 2023 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 April 2023 322 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 February 2022 253 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 February 2022 253 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 July 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 23 March 2021 296 days late Download Open in new window