Financial history AGORIAD CYFYNGEDIG

Charity Number: 1010165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.05m £814.47k £1.00m £834.54k £907.36k
Total expenditure £1.03m £701.32k £948.20k £898.82k £941.86k
Income from government contracts N/A £38.61k £59.99k £83.60k £154.92k
Income from government grants £82.34k £207.37k £14.95k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £25.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £405.77k £200.29k £264.25k £325.50k £453.11k
Income - Charitable activities £641.05k £614.18k £740.49k £484.04k £454.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2 £0 £0 £3 £8
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £645.88k £568.14k £642.64k £511.84k £433.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £380.27k £133.18k £296.59k £386.98k £504.10k
Expenditure - Governance £16.82k £17.70k £17.67k £16.59k £7.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £8.97k £0 £4.21k