Springboard Chippenham

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Springboard provides playgroup sessions for pre-school children from birth to 5 years old with special needs, and a support and information service for parents and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £75,442 from 1 government contract(s) and £91,241 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 April 1992: Standard registration
- 14 July 2020: Funds received from 1074220 THE NORTH WILTS HOLIDAY CLUB FOR CHILDREN AND YOUN...
- SPRINGBOARD (Working name)
- SPRINGBOARD NORTH WILTSHIRE OPPORTUNITY GROUP FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (Previous name)
- SPRINGBOARD-NORTH WILTS OPPORTUNITY PLAYGROUP FOR SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yasmin Anderson | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Everett | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kit Robert Hawkins | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul George Sweet | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Terence Nunn | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Light | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Susan Stewart | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.31k | £366.71k | £309.60k | £324.46k | £337.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.15k | £281.40k | £323.94k | £301.98k | £334.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £75.44k | £75.44k | £75.44k | £75.44k | £75.44k | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.88k | £99.99k | £87.26k | £106.06k | £91.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2013 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND STIMULATING GROUP PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE IN NORTH WILTSHIRE AND FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NORTH WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
King's Centre
Lodge Road
Chippenham
SN15 3SY
- Phone:
- 01249657145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window