THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CHEST FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i) To provide special equipment to aid the diagnosis, treatment and monitoring of all chest diseases. ii) To support research into all chest diseases. iii) To provide information about these diseases to you and other interested parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 April 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Jefferies | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Watson Roberts PhD FRSB | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH PRIOR | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR RAGHU | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ANDREW JAMES WHITE BSC FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON MESSAGE FRCP PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.99k | £2.48k | £1.83k | £1.58k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.98k | £1.00k | £736 | £374 | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH. NOVEMBER 1991, AMENDED 4T. MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE CHEST AND LUNGS AND ASSOCIATED DISORDERS IN PARTICULAR(BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT, ALLEVIATION AND CURE OF THE SAID DISEASES AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Chamberlain Road
Cardiff
CF14 2LX
- Phone:
- 07710145972
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window