PROVIDENCE BAPTIST CHAPEL, CHELTENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Christian Religion in accordance with the statement of faith and church covenant. Provide a place of worship. Teaching and educating all ages in the doctrines and practice of the religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 April 1992: Standard registration
- PROVIDENCE CHAPEL INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL - PROVIDENCE BAPTIST CHAPEL (Working name)
- PROVIDENCE CHAPEL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pooyan Mehrshahi | Chair | 24 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
Harvey Jeffreys | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Michael Jeffers | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY WILLIAM JAMES ILOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.30k | £63.93k | £69.64k | £104.90k | £115.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.28k | £52.99k | £52.27k | £61.88k | £82.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/1992 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND CHURCH COVENANT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHELTENHAM, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Providence Baptist Chapel
Naunton Parade
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 7NP
- Phone:
- 07962040579
- Email:
- h.jeffreys@cheltenham.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window