WESTCOUNTRY NATURAL HEALING FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The West Country Natural Healing Fellowship trains healers, and healer members of the fellowship give spiritual healing to members of the public who approach the organisation or individual healers. This is given free or for a donation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 April 1992: Standard registration
- 20 July 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 July 2021: Funds transferred to 284546 BRITISH ALLIANCE OF HEALING ASSOCIATIONS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £894 | £757 | £32 | £364 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £842 | £607 | £860 | £466 | £195 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 305 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 27 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH. OCTOBER 1991, AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 2004 AND 17 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND. (2)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ADVANCING EDUCATION IN AND TREATMENT BY SPIRITUAL HEALING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window