THE HOPE KIDNEY PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TheCharity has been reported to you as temporally inactive on a number of occasions without success and I have difficulty getting words out due to a recent stroke . I need help !!!!! Please can you contact me as soon so possibe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Trafford
Governance
- 08 April 1992: Standard registration
- HKPA (Working name)
- HOPE HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE HOPE KIDNEY PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH PENNINGTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANN HUNT | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
STUART POWELL | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.20k | £10.00k | £9.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.13k | £9.90k | £8.50k | £4.80k | £4.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED BY S74 (2) D (II) RESOLUTION 8 JUNE 1998 AND 5 NOVEMBER 1998. AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1999 AND 27 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS ATTENDING HOPE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 MILES LANE
SHEVINGTON
WIGAN
WN6 8EB
- Phone:
- 01257251417
- Email:
- info.hope-kpa@gmkin.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window