EAST YORKSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WI is a non-political, non-sectarian organisation whose aim is to educate women to enable them to provide an effective role in the community, to expand their horizons and to develop and pass on important skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 April 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Snowden | Chair | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chrissie Southall | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Williams | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Shields | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lyn Deighton | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Meffen | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harris | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Berry | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lambert | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fran Waudby | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Cowlam | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Mitchell | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Millar | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.09k | £49.82k | £59.61k | £71.53k | £75.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.82k | £50.58k | £59.61k | £74.59k | £79.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2022 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2022 | 283 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/04/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSE OF THE WOMENS INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN EAST YORKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
EAST YORKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Stables Offices
Molescroft Farm
Grange Way
BEVERLEY
HU17 9FS
- Phone:
- 01482860626
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window