Trustees HITCHIN BRITISH SCHOOLS TRUST
Charity number: 1010345

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fathima Nabeela Ameen | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Hon | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Black | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Watson | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Kikuchi | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zibiah Loakthar | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Green | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Margaret Unger | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Saunders | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Atterton | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.