Financial history ACTION FACTORY COMMUNITY ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1010355
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 28/03/2017 28/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £69.91k £70.36k £66.16k £35.76k £6.38k
Total expenditure £89.20k £76.23k £48.31k £46.86k £19.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £3.70k £3.50k N/A N/A