Financial history THE P A R CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1010358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.00m £805.55k £216.53k £340 £2.79m
Total expenditure £486 £148.01k £128.96k £118.77k £228.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.00m £805.55k N/A N/A £2.73m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A £51.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £147.53k N/A N/A £228.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.60k N/A N/A £33.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £143.93k N/A N/A £195.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £486 £481 N/A N/A £0