Financial history GREAT PAXTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1010401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.25k £2.25k £1.32k £1.53k £4.18k
Total expenditure £5.41k £2.97k £1.02k £763 £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A