THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTMINSTER PRIZE AND SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is the advancement of education by the awarding of prizes and scholarships tenable at the University of Westminster. The trust achieves its object by raising income through investments and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 10 April 1992: Standard registration
- THE POLYTECHNIC OF CENTRAL LONDON PRIZE AND SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTMINSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.24k | £41.67k | £17.37k | £18.42k | £38.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.41k | £5.86k | £1.49k | £66.38k | £1.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 21 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE FUND IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE AWARDING OF PRIZES AND SCHOLARSHIPS TENABLE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTMINSTER. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE RULES (WHICH MUST BE CONSISTENT WITH THIS SCHEME) FOR THE AWARD AND TERMS OF THE PRIZES AND SCHOLARSHIPS.
Area of benefit
LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Finance Department
University of Westminster
32-38 Wells Street
London
W1T 3UW
- Phone:
- 02079115000
- Email:
- I.Wilmot@westminster.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window