URMSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1010441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PTA for a grammar school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,628
Total expenditure: £8,405

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • URMSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Malcolm Gates Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Joanne Daley Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £1.88k £4.82k £5.19k £7.63k
Total expenditure £1.58k £1.70k £6.55k £5.51k £8.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Urmston Grammar
Newton Road
Urmston
Manchester
M41 5UG
Phone:
01617482875
Website:

No information available