Accounts and annual returns ROBERT SCHIFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1010509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required