THE ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THIS CHARITY NUMBER IS NO LONGER ACTIVE. THE ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST HAS BEEN MOVED TO A DIFFERENT CHARITY NUMBER AND THIS CHARITY IS BEING WOUND UP FOLLOWING INCORPORATION OF THE NEW CHARITY. PLEASE SEE ACCOUNTS FILED FOR ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST UNDER 1152707.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 April 1992: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1152707 THE ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST
- ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £389.14k | £403.24k | £441.74k | £233.30k | £149.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.95k | £360.11k | £402.54k | £621.43k | £761.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 May 2014 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 May 2014 | 110 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 21 May 2014 | 475 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 21 May 2014 | 475 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 11 April 2013 | 436 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 11 April 2013 | 436 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 17TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR (A)TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO SYSTEMIC ERYTHEMATOSUS (LUPUS) (B)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CAUSES EFFECTS AND PROPER TREATMENT OF LUPUS (C)TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LUPUS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window