ABUNDANT LIFE HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 April 1992: Standard registration
- ABUNDANT LIFE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FEMI AKINOLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KOLA ARIMORO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHINEDU ENELI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLUBUNMI OGUNBIYI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.00k | £100.00k | £315.02k | £361.36k | £183.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.00k | £100.00k | £312.23k | £335.62k | £246.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SOUTH LONDON BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY HOUSING FOR THE HOMELESS AND PROVIDING PERMANENT REHABILITATION FOR EX-OFFENDERS AND DRUG ADDICTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CAMPBELL ROAD
LONDON
E15 1SY
- Phone:
- 02085342194
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window