Charity overview WILLIAM ROPER FOR THE POOR
Charity number: 217207-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 24/9/ 1929 AND 14/2/1972. AS AMENDED ON 7/2/1995 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UN PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND AMENDED ON 8/2/1995 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS IN THE FOLLOWING CLASSED AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS: (1) WIDOWS OF MEMBERS OR PAST MEMBERS OF BODY CORPORATE REFERRED TO AS THE COMPANY IN THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME FOR THE CHARITIES OF THE 14TH FEBRUARY 1972; (2) DAUGHTERS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OR DECEASED PAST MEMBERS OF THE SAID COMPANY; (3) SONS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OR OF DECEASED CLERKS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (4) WIDOWS OF PAROCHIAL OR CHAPEL CLERKS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (5) PARISH CLERKS, VESTRY CLERKS, SECRETARIES OF PAROCHIAL OR GUILD CHURCH COUNCILS IN THE CITY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE AND THEIR WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS. THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 09 December 1963: Standard registration
- 14 August 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.