EDUCATION FOR CHOICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In order to ensure that young people are enabled to make and act on informed choices about pregnancy and abortion, Education For Choice provides: workshops in schools and pupil referral units; training for professionals in education, health, youth work and social care; resources for young people, professionals and parents; consultancy and research ; advocacy to support best practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 April 1992: Standard registration
- 13 December 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EFC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.32k | £77.88k | £96.86k | £186.76k | £163.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.73k | £96.98k | £111.50k | £149.01k | £145.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 09 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 21 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 3 DECEMBER 1997 BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING CONTRACEPTION, PREGNANCY, ABORTION AND CHILDBIRTH (2) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING CONCERNING CONTRACEPTION, PREGNANCY, ABORTION AND CHILDBIRTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window