BRISTOL AERO COLLECTION TRUST

Charity number: 1010632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operation of a Museum available to the public for the acquisition, preservation, restoration and display of the products of the Bristol aviation manufacturing organisations and their related artefacts. Provision of a research facility of exhibits and related documentation available to the public. Operation of the Concorde at Filton public attraction for hosting visitors to Concorde 216.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 1992: Standard registration
  • 01 October 2013: Funds received from 1119810 THE CONCORDE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRISTOL AERO COLLECTION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAIN GRAY Chair 21 February 2013
None on record
Joe Hensey Trustee 06 December 2024
None on record
Deborah Jane Gibbs Trustee 19 July 2024
None on record
Rachael Jayne Corver Trustee 18 December 2023
None on record
Robert James Yeandle Trustee 18 December 2023
BRISTOL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Peter John Chivers Trustee 18 December 2023
None on record
Jack Leonard Williams Trustee 18 December 2023
None on record
Sally Cordwell Trustee 13 May 2022
ARNOS VALE CEMETERY TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Charles PETTIT Trustee 21 December 2020
None on record
Sian Louise Maclean SMITH Trustee 21 December 2020
None on record
Matthew Christopher Sanders Trustee 16 December 2019
None on record
PAUL CRAIG Trustee 07 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.83m £2.34m £2.21m £3.05m £3.74m
Total expenditure £3.67m £2.06m £2.38m £3.25m £3.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100.19k £1.23m £63.16k £258.29k £63.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.23m £2.08m £1.11m £230.58k £421.75k
Income - Other trading activities £1.58m £44.31k £535.25k £2.03m £2.13m
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £207.59k £564.62k £780.58k £1.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £150.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.46m £1.87m £1.96m £2.05m £2.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.21m £181.57k £419.19k £1.20m £1.52m
Expenditure - Governance £35.35k £10.86k £16.00k £7.23k £11.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £16.74m £16.73m £16.66m £16.33m £15.96m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £873.99k £629.48k £1.14m £1.74m £536.18k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.13m £2.60m £3.22m £3.69m £2.07m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Aerospace Bristol
Hayes Way
Patchway
BRISTOL
BS34 5BZ
Phone:
01179315315