WILF SLACK YOUNG CRICKETERS'DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1010662
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF FUNDING TO CLUBS AND SPORTS GROUNDS IN LONDON & THE SOUTH EAST.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £31,204
Total expenditure: £16,479

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE WILF SLACK TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Jane Raja Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Alvan David Seth-Smith Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
ROBERT JOHN BAXTER Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
CLIVE THORTON RADLEY Trustee 11 February 2015
None on record
WINSTON BRENTHAM BRANDT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £45.37k £31.20k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £110.71k £16.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 June 2024 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 June 2024 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2022 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
White Gables
Wayside Avenue
BUSHEY
WD23 4SH
Phone:
02089502028
Website:

No information available