THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ST MARTIN'S HOSPITAL, BATH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing funds and identifying items and projects suitable for funding by the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 April 1992: Standard registration
- 14 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF ST MARTINS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.54k | £39.31k | £51.86k | £2.18k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.11k | £33.94k | £33.02k | £127.47k | £49.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 29 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 17 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 16 April 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 13 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 15 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 14 NOV 2002 AND 1 NOV 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PATIENTS OF ST MARTINS HOSPITAL INCLUDING; IN-PATIENTS, OUT-PATIENTS AND THOSE BEING CARED FOR IN THEIR HOME, OR OTHER HEALTH FACILITIES, EXCLUDING GP AND DENTAL SURGERIES, WITHIN THE AREA THAT IS OR HAS BEEN SERVED BY THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
BATH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window