Financial history FRIENDS OF COBBS GARDEN SURGERY

Charity number: 1010686
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £50.68k £43.55k £38.45k £22.54k £11.74k
Total expenditure £46.00k £54.16k £32.15k £28.63k £30.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A