FRIENDS OF COBBS GARDEN SURGERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Cobbs Garden Surgery was created to raise funds for services and equipment not provided by the NHS. Money is raised by way of fund-raising activities, donations and bequests from patients wishing to express their appreciation of the work of the surgery and from local businesses wishing to support a very worthwhile local cause.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 24 April 1992: Standard registration
- 13 October 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.68k | £43.55k | £38.45k | £22.54k | £11.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.00k | £54.16k | £32.15k | £28.63k | £30.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONGST PERSONS PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE COBBS GARDEN SURGERY OF OLNEY, BUCKS.
Area of benefit
OLNEY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window