SHROPSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1010690

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of grants to churches and chapels in Shropshire to assist with their repair and maintenance,especially those of architectural or historical significance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £91,572
Total expenditure: £138,438

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Robert Clark Chair 20 July 2023
None on record
RACHEL ADRIENNE PITTAWAY Trustee 20 July 2023
WHITTINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Stephen John Winwood Trustee 07 April 2022
PONTESBURY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
The Ven Fiona Ruth Gibson Trustee 27 May 2020
WILLIAM HENRY KINNAIRD GIBBONS (INCLUDING THE AUGMENTATION OF THE REVEREND ALFRED ERNEST LLOYD KENYON)
Received: On time
HEREFORD DIOCESAN CLERICAL CHARITY
Recently registered
Anne Edge Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
David Christian Hardham Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
JOHN WILLIAM COLE Trustee 01 April 2019
MARKET DRAYTON TOWN FC IN THE COMMUNITY TRUST.
Received: On time
GWEN SIDAWAY Trustee 25 September 2012
None on record
REV PREB DAVID CROWHURST Trustee 25 September 2012
THE SHROPSHIRE YOUTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
REVD CANON DR WILLIAM PRICE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £87.82k £57.00k £113.27k £92.48k £91.57k
Total expenditure £141.78k £90.30k £49.66k £197.77k £138.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Russell Place
Cross Houses
SHREWSBURY
SY5 6EY
Phone:
01743791690
Website:

shropshirehct.org.uk