THE PAKISTAN MUSLIM CENTRE (SHEFFIELD) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are hosting a range of projects and programmes in its impressively large building including children education projects , Healthy Lifestyles Project for the elderly, support for people suffering from mental health problems, and a core Women's Group. There is very low-cost gym usage for the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 24 April 1992: Standard registration
- PMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Khan | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sajid Mahmood | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aurangzeb Chaudry | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meamuna Rehman | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Altaf Ahmed | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ishfaq Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nighat Basharat | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.81k | £393.68k | £280.47k | £207.55k | £251.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.60k | £126.30k | £276.03k | £205.05k | £248.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.00k | N/A | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2015
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. B. TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF MUSLIM CULTURE. C. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID MUSLIM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODBOURN ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S9 3LQ
- Phone:
- 01142436091
- Email:
- info@pmcuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window