NORTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1010712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Community Village Hall providing a social venue for members of the village and their children to enjoy entertainment and social evenings. The Hall is also hired out to both villagers and non villagers for a fee

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £14,681
Total expenditure: £12,689

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • NORTON INSTITUTE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN PETER GREENFIELD Trustee
ASHBY DE LA ZOUCH AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LTD
Received: 42 days late
GEORGE ANTHONY THORP Trustee
None on record
ROBERT DOUGLAS VERO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.20k £15.23k £5.64k £10.02k £14.68k
Total expenditure £8.31k £5.81k £8.35k £9.45k £12.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.43k £8.91k N/A £392 £750

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 09 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 09 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Institute
Shelford Lane
Norton Juxta Twycross
ATHERSTONE
Warwickshire
CV9 3QD
Phone:
07747058512