Accounts and annual returns ST MARKS SHELTON SCHOOL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1010729
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 February 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required