Financial history KHEDRUBJE CENTRE

Charity number: 1010758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.25k £43.66k £45.14k £47.28k £52.28k
Total expenditure £48.37k £36.74k £38.30k £40.38k £47.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A