THE ETHIOPIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (UK)

Charity number: 1010782
Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training Overseas aid/Famine relief Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE ETHIOPIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH, UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHERENET KEFELEGN METAFERIA Trustee
None on record
TAYE KEBEDE Trustee
None on record
ESTEDDAR MARIAM LULSEGGED MCGREGOR Trustee
None on record
ERGATE AYANA Trustee
None on record
SYOUM ALEMAYEHU HAILE-SELASSI Trustee
None on record
Dr GETACHEW ZERGAW TIRUNEH Trustee
None on record
DR YIKUNO-AMLAK YIGZAW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £403.36k £426.99k £444.25k £553.26k £0
Total expenditure £323.53k £315.94k £309.77k £359.23k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £518.34k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £34.89k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £282.27k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £76.95k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £76.95k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ECFC, UK
178 KINGS CROSS ROAD
LONDON
WC1X 9DE
Phone:
02072780010