SURREY GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the education of the public in matters connected with the arts and sciences of garden land. Helps to preserve, enhance and re-create for the education and enjoyment of the public, whatever garden land may exist or have existed in and around the County of Surrey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 April 1992: Standard registration
- 29 July 2024: Funds received from 1187706 THE ARTS SOCIETY CAMBERLEY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH FRANCES DICKINSON | Chair | 30 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sian Abigail Joseph | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nuala Clare Livesey | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Pullen | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Buttle | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Parvin | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Creaye-Griffin | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Isobel Frances White | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheri Ann Sticpewich | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM HANSON | Trustee | 05 December 1996 |
|
|||||
MARION DELL WOODWARD | Trustee | 06 December 1993 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JOY LEWIS | Trustee | 30 October 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.40k | £12.85k | £32.23k | £17.74k | £21.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.02k | £14.74k | £15.73k | £22.32k | £22.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4TH DECEMBER 1997 AND 11 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF GARDEN LAND (B)TO PRESERVE, ENHANCE AND RE-CREATE FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC, WHATEVER GARDEN LAND MAY EXIST OR HAVE EXISTED IN AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF SURREY.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELMONT
PARK CLOSE
FETCHAM
LEATHERHEAD
KT22 9BD
- Phone:
- 01372374020
- Email:
- dwhanson@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window