THE PARSON WOODFORDE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1010807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General information about the Society can be found on the website www.parsonwoodforde.org.uk. Each year we publish four journals and newsletters. We have the long-term objective of transcribing the Diary of James Woodforde in a series of volumes which are published and also made available to various libraries and statutory depositories. We make an annual gift to the Church at Weston Longville.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £17,416
Total expenditure: £16,039

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill George Trustee 21 September 2024
None on record
Stewart Waterston Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Diane McKay Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Margaret Bird Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Alan Ovenden Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
David Atterbury Thomas Trustee 27 March 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WALBROOK
Received: 14 days late
THE STANFORD SOCIETY
Received: 48 days late
Colin Peter McKay Trustee 28 September 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ATTENBOROUGH.
Received: 85 days late
BRIAN RICHARDSON Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record
Martin Brayne Trustee 14 May 1993
None on record
JENNY ALDERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.18k £7.14k £6.60k £4.99k £17.42k
Total expenditure £8.28k £5.28k £6.64k £9.61k £16.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
68 HILLSIDE ROAD
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 3AY
Phone:
07503733015