PEAKIRK WATERFOWL GARDENS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 30 April 1992: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2005 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 19 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND STUDY OF WILDFOWL AND THE WETLANDS FORMING THEIR HABITAT AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEE IS CALCULATED TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND OF INTEREST IN WILDFOWL IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD AND TO MAINTAIN AN ESTABLISHMENT AT PEAKIRK AND SUCH OTHER BRANCH ESTABLISHMENTS AS THE TRUST MAY THINK FIT WHICH WILL PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE CONSERVATION OF WILDFOWL AND WETLANDS THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF WILDFOWL AND THEIR WETLAND HABITAT DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF WILDFOWL WETLANDS AND CONSERVATION AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIVE RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window