Accounts and annual returns THE FRANCES WOOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1010851
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 March 2009 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 February 2008 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 06 March 2008 35 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 February 2007 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 April 2006 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 10 April 2006 69 days late