OLD COULSDON COLTS BOYS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating young people by providing facilities for teaching the game of football and when appropriate to enter leagues to play organised games against other teams. We provide a safe environment with qualified volunteers to teach and organise. We have achieved Football Association Charter Status signifying our ability to carry out the tasks and currently cater for around 210 young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 May 1992: Standard registration
- OLD COULSDON COLTS FC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Alger | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harris | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JANES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.55k | £66.05k | £57.01k | £15.89k | £46.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.08k | £64.33k | £56.39k | £26.81k | £48.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2025 | 728 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2025 | 728 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS AND YOUNG MEN, PARTICULARLY THOSE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14 AND 20 THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOPE THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Tollers Lane
Coulsdon
CR5 1BF
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- CLIVE.ALGER@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
occfc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window